Governing document CARE FOR VETERANS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 OCT 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 SEP 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21 AUG 2017 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE PERMANENT OR RESPITE ACCOMMODATION, END OF-LIFE CARE AND OUTPATIENT CARE FOR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE BRITISH ARMED FORCES AND THEIR FAMILIES, WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH CARE BY REASON OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY AND WHO REQUIRE NURSING CARE OR REHABILITATION.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.