Trustees THE SWANAGE RAILWAY TRUST
Charity number: 1087318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gavin Christopher Johns | Chair | 27 November 2012 |
|
|||||
Frank Roberts | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Collins | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Jack Ford | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Patterson | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Ivan Armstron-Sheret | Trustee | 21 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER NICHOLAS SILLS | Trustee | 24 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR JOHN PARSONS | Trustee | 27 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ALAN WHITWAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH MAUREEN SELLEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.