Trustees GLASTONBURY ABBEY
Charity number: 1129263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ODGERS | Chair | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Monica Sidique | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS GUY MAY | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|||||
PAUL BENTLEY HEAL | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|||||
EDWARD GREGORY | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr WILLIAM BLOOM | Trustee | 02 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND DOCTOR ANNE ELIZABETH GELL | Trustee | 20 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Martin Thomas | Trustee | 19 September 2014 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN BIRD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV D MACGEOCH | Trustee |
|
||||||
JANICE EMILY WHITE | Trustee |
|
||||||
PROF ROBERTA GILCHRIST | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr ROBERT JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.