Trustees BLACKPOOL ICE DROME CHARITIES ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1143903
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KERRY ASHTON | Chair | 22 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Kelly Rata | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Louise Solanki | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Dudley Cox | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Mann | Trustee | 09 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Walsh | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Holyhead | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Swarbrick | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Clare Davies | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anna-Louise Sarah Williams | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Ashton | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.