Trustees COLEG SIR GAR
Charity number: 1152522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Colin Peter Spring | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenna Faye Loweth | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Senchal | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqui Kedward | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Jayne Salini | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mike Theodoulou | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Francis | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Williams | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Alan Smith | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louis Dare | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Erica Cassin | Trustee | 05 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
EIFION GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Andrew Cornish | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|||||
John Edge | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|||||
Huw Davies | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Delwyn Jones | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.