Trustees BERKSHIRE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1155173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Howard | Chair | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Charles Burrows | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Potter | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Elliott | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Darren Browne | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Roberts | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Horwood | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Debra AllcockTyler | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Haines MVO | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Barfield | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
SEAN TAYLOR DL | Trustee | 06 August 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.