Trustees MARSKE SPORTS AND RECREATION PARTNERSHIP
Charity number: 1170117
Charity reporting is up to date (83 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER MAURICE THOMAS | Chair | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rima DeFord | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nannette Bulman | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Gaye Batiz | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Howard Leake | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stanley Glover | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
David John Sanders | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|||||
JOAN GRIMWOOD | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.