Trustees BRECKNOCK FEDERATION OF YFC
Charity number: 1169501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
30 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Bowen | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Healey | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Matthews | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sian Healey | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Healey | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Rees | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke Smith | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Craig Jones | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Brown | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ieuan Williams | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elin Havard | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Coles | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gethin Williams | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Niall Evans | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ffion Williams | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Hyde | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Thomas | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Davies | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ffion Price | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iwan Davies | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sam Davies | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Baden Davies | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Libby Davies | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sioned Davies | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elin Protheroe | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Davies | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Rees | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carwyn Pugh | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jones | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Watkins | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.