Trustees NANTWICH CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 516572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Harbage | Chair | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Elaine Powdrill Robinson | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Peter Jowitt | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Francis Jones | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Frances Harwood | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Adrian Percy | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Frances Brenda Durkin | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Diane Wheatley | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr ROBERT PUGH | Trustee | 31 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
ESTER HARRIES | Trustee | 31 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN SHEILA ROBERTSON | Trustee | 31 March 2011 |
|
|||||
RACHEL ANN PENTECOST | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.