Trustees STAFFORDSHIRE COUNTY GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 524559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlie Quinby | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jayne Kane | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Ward | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Aston | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dyanne Sargeant | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Claire Smith | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
TRUDY JANE REALE | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Debra Kay Jolley | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Annette Susan Gould | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Karen Poyser | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Cassell | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Kim Lesley Waldron | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine James | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Alison Jane Holmes | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catriona Aileen Kerr | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Mary Chamberlain | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Sage | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Marie Miller | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Jill Piggott | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Louise Williams | Trustee | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE ANNE FETTES | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.