Trustees STAFFORDSHIRE NORTH AND STOKE-ON-TRENT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX
Charity number: 1001204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Grahamslaw | Chair | 01 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Keith Hoptroff | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Magda Styles | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Dawson | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Starla Willins | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Ware | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Hall | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Connor Brady | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Powner | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
BERTRAM CEDRIC LAWTON | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Emor Porteous | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Holt | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAMES DAVIES | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
REGINALD JOHN PEMBERTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.