Governing document GLOBAL POLICY LONDON LTD
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 SEPTEMBER 1987 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 4 JUNE 1991 AND 28 JULY 1993 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04 FEB 2019 as amended on 05 May 2022
Charitable objects
To advance such charitable purposes (according to the law of England and Wales) as the trustees see fit from time to time, in particular but not limited to advancing the education of the public by acting as an educational institute that conducts research, offers policy advice, provides training and short courses, teaches and supervises postgraduates, and disseminates its work through lectures, seminars, public events, social media, websites and publications.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.