Trustees HAVERING UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1017415
Charity reporting is overdue by 45 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN CHARLES CLAYDEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Barbara Pereira | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Marner | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Davis | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jean Gerrish | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Ann Fenegan | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM ERNEST LYONS | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN ANTHONY HUDSON | Trustee | 14 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM FENEGAN | Trustee | 08 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GORDON | Trustee | 11 December 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.