Governing document SAFER PLACES
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/02/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/01/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/01/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/05/2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/09/2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING WITH OR FLEEING FROM OR AT RISK OF DOMESTIC ABUSE INCLUDING STALKING AND HARASSMENT; TO PROVIDE EDUCATION FOR THEIR FUTURE BENEFIT; TO EDUCATE THOSE WHO WORK WITH VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND TO PROVIDE SOCIAL HOUSING FOR THOSE SUFFERING, FLEEING, OR AT RISK OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, STALKING AND HARASSMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.