Trustees WOOLSTON AND SHOLING WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1021341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIANE PIROUET | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ann Richards | Trustee | 05 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Burnett | Trustee | 04 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joy Nestor | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
THELMA MILLER | Trustee | 03 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA AIREY | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
VERA MOODY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNDA GILES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LIN GATEHOUSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.