Trustees BUCKFAST RESIDENTS SOCIETY
Charity number: 1042567
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELAINE HILDA DAY | Chair | 12 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paul Gilbert John Curtis | Trustee | 22 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Diane Jones | Trustee | 22 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Gardner | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Hodgkiss | Trustee | 24 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Griffiths | Trustee | 21 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
TINA MAY MITCHELMORE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.