Trustees 2ND MALVERN SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1044413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter John Charles Reeve | Chair | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andy Mitchell | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Heath | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Smith | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Allen | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Reeve | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Wood | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shaylene Kitchener | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr MICHAEL ADRIAN WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.