Trustees THE FEINMANN TRUST
Charity number: 1045149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN HYAMS | Chair | 20 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Sher | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Phillip Abrahams | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hope Stone | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Lawrence Sugarman | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Alexander | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN LISTER | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.