Trustees MARY HARE
Charity number: 1048386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Elizabeth Shepherd | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Clements | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Mark Polack | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Anne Butcher | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Essington Penfold | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Lilias Cheyne Woods | Trustee | 09 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Michelle Rowles | Trustee | 09 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Bisset | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sallie Greenhalgh | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANGUS WILLIAM MCPHAIL | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|||||
ADRIAN MCALPINE | Trustee | 18 June 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.