Trustees 12TH COLCHESTER SEA SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1050322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laurence Dove | Chair | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Simon Newman | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Smale | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Stewart-Thomas | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Coates | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLARK CAMPBELL | Trustee | 04 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN KURY | Trustee | 04 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALLI KURY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.