Trustees THE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE TAUNTON (U3A)
Charity number: 1051405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Anthony Tompsett | Chair | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Stanley Welch | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Maureen Richmond | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michele Edmonds | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robin Haydon | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Margaret Kenward | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Straus | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Paul Dinham | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pat Mabberley | Trustee | 15 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Rose Kitson | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.