Trustees Ruislip Turtles Swimming Club
Charity number: 1055585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Jayne Johnston | Chair | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ajay Joginipally | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Ruth Macintyre | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Anne Lee | Trustee | 09 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Terry Mark Cheshire | Trustee | 15 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter John William Horne | Trustee | 21 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Bijan Ghorbanian | Trustee | 21 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Andrew Mark Wallis | Trustee | 21 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Ann Noyes | Trustee | 21 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Linda Susan Clarke | Trustee | 21 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LEE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.