Governing document NATURE CURE TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17/06/1965 AS AMENDED ON 31/01/1993 AS AMENDED ON 24/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 12/04/2013 AS AMENDED ON 24 APR 2017 AS AMENDED ON 22 APR 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF NATUROPATHY:- (A) TO FOSTER ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE IN NATUROPATHY BY PROMOTING RESEARCH THEREIN. (B) TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AND PRACTIONERS IN NATUROPATHY AND IN THE GENERAL PRACTICE OF NATURE CURE AND NATURAL HEALING.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.