Trustees THE LISTER INSTITUTE OF PREVENTIVE MEDICINE
Charity number: 206271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Smithson | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Professor John Julian Blow | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Rosalind Louise Smyth FMedSci | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
murray john legg | Trustee | 04 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Stephen McMahon | Trustee | 06 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Pamela Jean Shaw DBE | Trustee | 07 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Professor John Peter Iredale | Trustee | 08 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Rebecca Clare Fitzgerald | Trustee | 04 September 2015 |
|
|||||||
Sir Adrian Peter Bird | Trustee | 04 September 2015 |
|
|||||||
PROFESSOR DOUGLAS HIGGS | Trustee | 17 August 2012 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR ALEC JOHN JEFFREYS FRS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
HONORABLE RORY MICHAEL BENJAMIN GUINNESS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.