Accounts and annual returns ST LUKE'S HOSPITAL FOR THE CLERGY
Charity number: 209236
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 11 January 2011 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 10 January 2011 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 25 November 2009 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 20 November 2009 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 23 October 2008 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 09 July 2008 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 26 October 2007 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 28 June 2007 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 10 October 2006 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 12 October 2006 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window