Trustees THE INCORPORATED BENEVOLENT FUND OF THE INSTITUTION OF GAS ENGINEERS AND MANAGERS
Charity number: 214010
Charity reporting is up to date (224 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eric Swindells | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Oliver Lancaster | Trustee | 18 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Musgrave | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Carol Hymers | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Terry Woods | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Parkin | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Connor O'Reilly | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Ransom | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Chak | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Griffiths | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Thomson | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Rourke | Trustee | 14 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Linda Mee | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
GORDON DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOMINIC PAUL CUMMINGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT MURRAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHOBNA MISTRY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.