Trustees REVEREND JOHN ASHTON'S CHARITY (ESTATE TRUSTEES)
Charity number: 216941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael David Birch | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Peter Hallam | Trustee | 05 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Thomas Michael Irwin | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Leslie John Jackson | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Brian Snow | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heather James | Trustee | 07 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Ipstones Parish Council | Trustee |
|
||||||
JANET MAY CHADWICK | Trustee |
|
||||||
LINDA ANN MALYON | Trustee |
|
||||||
PATRICK STIMPSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANDREW WEST STEVENSON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.