Trustees RANBY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 224966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wayne Andrew Holtom | Chair | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grant Richard Rawlins | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen O'Brien Crawley | Trustee | 24 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR GEOFF CARSWELL | Trustee | 14 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Anne Dobson | Trustee | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Emblen | Trustee | 10 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EDWARD HILTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLIVE HEBDON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.