Governing document NORTHUMBERLAND AGED MINEWORKERS' HOMES ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND BYE-LAWS ADOPTED 7 APRIL 1973 AS VARIED 30 MAY 1987, 29 JUNE 1991 AND 1 DECEMBER 1992 as amended on 28 Oct 2022 as amended on 21 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE HOMES, WITH OR WITHOUT GARDENS AND OTHER ACCESSORIES AS RESIDENCES FOR BONA-FIDE MINEWORKERS IN THE AREA OF NORTHUMBERLAND NOT LESS THEN 60 YEARS OF AGE WHO SHALL IMMEDIATELY PRIOR TO CEASING WORK HAVE BEEN EMPLOYED IN OR ABOUT A COAL MINE IN THE AREA OF NORTHUMBERLAND.
Area of benefit
AREA OF NORTHUMBERLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.