Trustees COLEFORD BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 234789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geraint Williams | Chair | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Ann Marie Beard | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Gwynneth Weaver | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Sam Davis | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Eastaugh | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ivor Bramwell Green | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Barbara Swinyard | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Mary Ellen Davis | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Baptist Union of Great Britain | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.