Trustees INSTITUTE OF BIOMEDICAL SCIENCE
Charity number: 261926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Andrew | Chair | 03 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Rouse | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel David Kearns | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Deacon | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Azuma Kalu | Trustee | 03 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Glen McDowell | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheri Scott | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tahmina Hussain | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Collins | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Jane Pitt | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Elizabeth Jean-Francois | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Houston | Trustee | 24 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zonya Jeffrey | Trustee | 24 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Victoria Bradley | Trustee | 13 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Linda Walsh | Trustee | 08 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Coles | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEBRA PADGETT | Trustee | 23 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN USHER | Trustee | 02 June 2001 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.