Governing document ASHTEAD CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 265400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 28TH SEPTEMBER 1970 AMENDED 1991, 6 OCTOBER 1997, 12 OCTOBER 1998, 18 OCTOBER 1999 AND 11 DECEMBER 2006 as amended on 19 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF PUBLIC TASTE BY THE PRACTICE AND PERFORMANCE OF SACRED AND SECULAR CHORAL MUSIC.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.