Trustees 5TH WOODBRIDGE SEA SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 268625
Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Bell | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Keer | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Calver | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Bell | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Davies | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eamonn Cullinan | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Owen | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Flora Winter | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Perry | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
craig finch | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Liesl Villiers | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Russell | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ben Whittle | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Claire Owen | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicola Notcutt | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barrie Hayter | Trustee | 10 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
MS Niicola Tooke | Trustee | 23 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Douse | Trustee | 26 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MAGGIE ULPH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.