Trustees TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY SURREY
Charity number: 270460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Staunton | Chair | 08 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Annabel Garratt | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Greenhalgh | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Scott White | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEITH FRASER | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kay Bovis | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.