Trustees 3RD DUNSTABLE ST PETER'S SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 276542
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Dearden | Chair | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Mccormick | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Mark Wilson | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Grant Palmer | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Redford | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Short | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Mrs Michelle Ann Milton | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARY SHORT | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.