Trustees PROCESSORS AND GROWERS RESEARCH ORGANISATION
Charity number: 284077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES SARGENT STOWE | Chair | 19 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
George James Renner | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Shuldham | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Ashley Maguire | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Matthew Hopwood | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas James Yewbrey | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Debbie Louise Sparkes | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR John Richard Stanton Ward | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Jeffrey Portas | Trustee | 22 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
David John Sedgley | Trustee | 07 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN WILLIAM BUMSTEAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW BURY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN JOHN FRANCIS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.