Trustees MUSIC FOR YOUTH
Charity number: 285831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexandra Merckx | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Churcher | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Mark Dixon Mr | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Collin Hills | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Pelluet | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Moor | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hutchinson | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Bull | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Kingston | Trustee | 06 December 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.