Trustees GREAT AND LITTLE WARLEY W.I.
Charity number: 296378
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAM TEE | Chair | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Cash | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Traveller | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Jan Bennett | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN SHORT | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE CLARKE | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Judy Brookes | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
MAVIS HUMM | Trustee | 07 June 2013 |
|
|||||
Valerie Sullivan | Trustee | 13 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
RITA ANDERSON | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|||||
SUSAN CULLEN | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.