Governing document INTERNATIONAL MASONRY SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES 16TH JUNE 1986 CONSTITUTION 4TH JUNE 1987 AS AMENDED 24TH JULY 1989 AND 26 JUNE 1998, AS AMENDED 19 NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
3.1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION AND PROVISION OF DISCUSSION AND ELUCIDATION OF THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF MASONRY INCLUDING THE SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY OF ITS CONSTITUENT MATERIALS, THE AESTHETIC, ENGINEERING, CONSTRUCTIONAL DESIGN AND THE BUILDING AND SUPERVISION OF STRUCTURES AND FORMS AND THE BEHAVIOUR OF THE MATERIALS IN USE, FOR THE PURPOSE OF IMPROVING UNDERSTANDING OF THE PERFORMANCE OF THE MATERIAL TO THE BENEFIT OF MANUFACTURERS, PRACTITIONERS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN PROVIDING A MORE LASTING, AESTHETICALLY PLEASING, HEALTHY AND SOCIALLY DESIRABLE LIVING ENVIRONMENT. 3.2) FOR THOSE PURPOSES TO PROVIDE MEANS FOR BRINGING INTO CONTACT AND ASSOCIATION THOSE ENGAGED IN MASONRY SCIENCE, DESIGN AND INDUSTRY AND LIKEWISE TO RECEIVE, EDIT, PRINT AND PUBLISH PAPERS AND OTHER LITERARY UNDERTAKINGS AND TO FORM OR MAINTAIN A LIBRARY OF MASONRY AND ALLIED LITERATURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.