Trustees 1ST LINSLADE SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 300160
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mathew Dowden | Chair | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Donna Wilkinson | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Skinner | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Leigh | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Skinner | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Helden | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN HELDEN | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY JANE DASS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.