Trustees VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 301171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Joy | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Willett | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Joy | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Whittle | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Scarlett | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Randall | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paula Chidley-Randall | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lobb | Trustee | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Scutt | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL STANBURY | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Crabb | Trustee | 15 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
JANE WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BOB PITCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.