Trustees 3RD CHALKWELL BAY SEA SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 302078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothey Iain Stuart Browne | Chair | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chantal Snarey | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sydney Nash | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica-Hope Dean | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Jones | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Kemp | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Osborne | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louise Baxter | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Douglas Daly | Trustee | 29 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin David Cruiks | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Ingrosso | Trustee | 25 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel John Parsons | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Frank Pickford | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Edmund Jacob | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Karen Cruiks | Trustee | 19 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Ayling | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Mary Ayling | Trustee | 09 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Heath Whiteley | Trustee | 27 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Paul Charles Cottrell | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.