Trustees GILLINGHAM SCHOOL
Charity number: 306212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas James Borrill | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Rickus Day | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Hopton | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Simmone Shearn | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Uden | Trustee | 31 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Harvey | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Patrick Andrews | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Matthew Lake | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
EMMA VALLENDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
TIMOTHY SHARP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ANDREW JENKINS | Trustee |
|
||||||||
GUY CHRISTOPHER LOWTON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JANE REES | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.