Trustees ASHFORD GRAMMAR SCHOOL ENDOWMENT FUND
Charity number: 307842
Charity reporting is overdue by 231 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Wilfred Race | Chair | 28 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Alistair James Harland Small | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Philip Frederick Stephenson Sibbald | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Ben Greene | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Simon Hallam | Trustee | 06 November 2014 |
|
|||||
RICHARD FRASER | Trustee |
|
||||||
The Hon Michael-John Knatchbull | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.