Trustees MUSEUM OF CAMBRIDGE
Charity number: 311309
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Claire Allen-Johnstone | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth McPhee | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maria Antonieta Nestor | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Al Herron | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Bastin | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Grace Margaret Wilson | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Judith Astill | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Hann | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roger Gunning Lilley | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Lowe Mr | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Mary Walker | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.