Trustees LITTLE BOOKHAM MANOR HOUSE SCHOOL
Charity number: 312063
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS G SIMS-BRASSETT | Chair | 20 June 2014 |
|
|||||
Ms M Kieran | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Harris | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
CP Heath-Taylor | Trustee | 26 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
SE Clare | Trustee | 09 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARJORIE JOY RICHARDSON | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN STEPHEN RUSCOE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL ROBERT PARKHOUSE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.