Trustees 33RD OXFORD (KIDLINGTON) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1068248
Charity reporting is up to date (76 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW INNES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Elery Pellagatti | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Kendall | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Smith | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Tracy Samantha Rampton | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Gregson | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Lavender | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Bagnall | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ben Hunt | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Hewer | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lucille Worth | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Rhymes | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Cox | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Butcher | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Rushby | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
GILES PULESTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RON SHEWRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LONNIE BOGGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL HOPCRAFT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JONATHAN EYLES | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARGARET ANN BOGGS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.