Trustees THE FRIENDS OF MENDIP HOSPITAL CEMETERY
Charity number: 1085981
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER DOUGLAS JAGGARD | Chair | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Waters | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Waters | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Blackmore | Trustee | 15 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Heather MacCormack | Trustee | 15 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RAYMOND SLATER | Trustee | 14 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM EDWARD LIVINGS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.