Governing document CITIZENS ADVICE SHROPSHIRE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/10/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/04/2003 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 07/02/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/11/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 NOV 2017 as amended on 28 Nov 2023 as amended on 28 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN SHROPSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
SHROPSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.