Trustees CBA EAST
Charity number: 1086510
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AILEEN CONNOR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Richard Mark Booth PDBM | Trustee | 03 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth George Dodd | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Geoff Lunn | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Charles Gordon MA | Trustee | 25 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Instone BA | Trustee | 26 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Louise Harrison | Trustee | 26 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Edward Curteis | Trustee | 02 May 2015 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL ARTHUR THOMAS COLES MBE MSt | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.